Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a candidate who is defeated for the nomination for a public office from filing a certificate of candidacy as a write-in candidate at the next succeeding general election as a candidate for any office.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0390
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-13)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Election Law - Candidate Defeated in Primary Election - Write-In Candidacy in General Election Prohibited
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (121-13) 43A
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-313, 5-303, 5-706 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:22 PM