Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, Cullison, Kipke, Bagnall, Barron, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to use a reverse auction, as provided for in certain provisions of law established by the Act, to select a pharmacy benefits manager or other entity to administer the State Rx Program; requiring the Department to procure a certain platform and associated services in a certain manner a certain period of time before the reverse auction is scheduled to be completed; requiring the Department to consult with certain other Departments in conducting a certain procurement; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {816880/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {816880/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Text - Chapter - State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1601 )
(   2-502.1, 2-502.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:22 PM