Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Kelly, Acevero, B. Barnes, Barron, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Hill, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, McIntosh, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a single-occupancy public restroom be marked with certain gender-inclusive signage in certain places of public accommodation and certain public buildings; authorizing certain places of public accommodation to use certain gender-inclusive signage that was in use before October 1, 2020; providing that a county or municipality is responsible for enforcing the signage requirement in place of public accommodation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0401
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   20-301, 20-307 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page