Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Historical Trust, on or before July 1, 2021, to extinguish or terminate a certain easement the Trust holds in the parcel of land known as the Warfield Complex located in Carroll County; and requiring the Trust to complete certain necessary recordings and filings to complete the extinguishment or termination of the easement.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0839
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Historical Trust - Warfield Complex in Carroll County - Extinguishment or Termination of Easement
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page