Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, K. Young, Bartlett, Carey, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Howard, Kelly, Lehman, Pendergrass, Proctor, Shetty, Valderrama, Barron, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System in the Maryland Department of Health to provide a statewide system through which health care providers can identify and access available inpatient and outpatient mental health and substance use services for patients in a certain manner; requiring the Department to develop and implement the Registry and Referral System in collaboration with the State-designated Health Information Exchange, subject to the availability of funds; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {186482/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {186482/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Registry and Referral System
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7.5-801, 7.5-802 )
Last Updated: 10/13/2020 4:35 PM