Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Procurement Improvement Council – Form for Discussion and Report on the Required Use of eMaryland Marketplace
Sponsored by
Delegates Charles, Acevero, B. Barnes, Crosby, D.E. Davis, Hornberger, Ivey, Johnson, Kelly, Lehman, Morgan, Mosby, Smith, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Procurement Improvement Council to provide a forum to discuss the use of eMaryland Marketplace and compliance with certain provisions of law; and requiring the Council to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021, on guidelines on the publication of certain notices and awards on eMaryland Marketplace and recommendations on strategies and enforcement mechanisms to improve certain compliance.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {526089/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Procurement Improvement Council - Required Use of eMaryland Marketplace
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {526089/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement – Procurement Improvement Council – Form for Discussion and Report on the Required Use of eMaryland Marketplace
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:20 PM