Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Certification - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Charles
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals to maintain an electronic roster of all individuals certified by the Board; requiring that the roster be available for electronic verification of certification through the Board's website; authorizing certain individuals to contact the Board to verify a certificate; and repealing a certain requirement that a certain renewal notice sent by the Board contain certain information.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Certification - Revisions
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Certification - Revisions
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 47B
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-307, 20-310 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:20 PM