Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Residential Composting and Pickup Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Charkoudian, W. Fisher, R. Lewis, Mosby, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain qualified expenses paid or incurred by the individual in a taxable year for certain composting equipment or certain compost pickup services; providing that the tax credit may be claimed only once per residence in any taxable year and may not exceed the lesser of the cost of the qualified expenses or $200; providing that any unused credit may not be carried forward; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Residential Composting and Pickup Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Residential Composting and Pickup Services
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 9:52 AM