Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Denial of Transfer Credit – Notice and Report (Transfer With Success Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Acevero, Bridges, Conaway, Forbes, Hettleman, Hornberger, Korman, Lehman, Lopez, Love, Qi, Stewart, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain procedures that require a public institution of higher education that denies the transfer of credits to an enrolled student to report the denial to the institution from which the transfer student originates and submit to the Commission a report each year listing the denials and the reasons for the denials; and requiring the procedures to direct the institution from which the transfer student originates to conduct a review of the reasons for the denial.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education – Denial of Transfer Credit – Notice and Report (Transfer With Success Act)
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {124867/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education – Denial of Transfer Credit – Notice and Report (Transfer With Success Act)
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page