Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Comparability and Competitiveness
Sponsored by
Delegates D. Barnes, Acevero, Anderson, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barron, Bartlett, Boyce, C. Branch, Bridges, Brooks, Carr, Charles, Conaway, Crosby, Crutchfield, D.E. Davis, D.M. Davis, Feldmark, Fennell, W. Fisher, Harrison, Haynes, Henson, Holmes, Ivey, C. Jackson, M. Jackson, Krimm, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Rogers, Smith, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, R. Watson, Wells, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to work with the historically black colleges and universities (HBCUs) in the State to approve and prioritize certain academic programs and to promote the overall competitiveness of the HBCUs; requiring the Governor, in fiscal years 2022 through 2031, to include in the annual State operating budget certain funds for certain HBCUs to be used for a specific purpose; requiring that certain funds become part of the base funds for certain HBCUs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0856
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Comparability and Competitiveness
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-206, 11-206.1, 12-119, 14-111 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM