Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the governing body of a condominium to convene at least two meetings each year; requiring a developer of a condominium or a declarant of a homeowners association to convene a certain annual meeting under certain circumstances; requiring certain meetings to include an opportunity for certain unit owners or lot owners to provide comment; requiring the developer of a condominium to appoint a unit owner to the board of directors within 30 days after 25% of the currently subdivided units have been conveyed to the public; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {220116/2 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {220116/2 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109, 11-114.1, 11-116, 11-132, 11B-101, 11B-106.1, 11B-111, 11B-111.6, 11B-112 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:17 PM