Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Contaminants in Campus Buildings - Review, Monitoring, and Remediation
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Solomon, Acevero, Attar, D. Barnes, Bartlett, Boyce, Carey, Carr, Chang, Charles, Clark, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Harrison, Healey, Malone, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Saab, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Walker, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the University System of Maryland to establish an ongoing monitoring program for identifying and monitoring contaminants in campus buildings; requiring the University System of Maryland to develop a certain system-wide process for submitting certain concerns; specifying that the system-wide process must include a certain timeline and certain actions; requiring the University System of Maryland to conduct a comprehensive environmental review of each campus building within the University System of Maryland; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Contaminants in Campus Buildings - Review, Monitoring, and Remediation
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-119 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:17 PM