Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Acevero, Barve, Chang, Charkoudian, Kelly, Korman, R. Lewis, Love, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Shetty, Solomon, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain county or municipality, after giving 60 days written notice to the electric company and the Public Service Commission, to convert its street lighting service to a certain alternative-energy-only tariff, submit a request to acquire certain street lighting equipment from the electric company, and enter into an agreement to purchase electricity for a certain use from any available electricity supplier under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:17 PM