Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, T. Branch, Cardin, Haynes, Impallaria, C. Jackson, Krebs, Mautz, McComas, Metzgar, Qi, Queen, Terrasa, Turner, Walker, P. Young, Carey, Charkoudian, Crosby, Fennell, Rogers, Valderrama, C. Watson, and Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the scope of apprenticeship and training programs that may receive certain support through the Clean Energy Workforce Account from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund for clean energy industry development; providing that $750,000 in funds from the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund, be designated for the recruitment of individuals, including veterans and formerly incarcerated individuals, to the pre-apprenticeship jobs training programs and registered apprenticeship jobs training programs beginning in fiscal 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0224
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1158 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733895/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {733895/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Finance 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 409
Text - Chapter - Clean Energy Jobs - Workforce Development - Scope
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/17/2020 10:57 AM