Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations requiring electric companies and electric cooperatives to adopt a method for an electricity supplier enrolling a certain customer to provide certain information to adequately identify the customer without using the customer's account number; requiring the regulations to require that a certain customer enrolling with an electricity supplier may offer certain information as proof of identity under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:16 PM