Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity – Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga, Arikan, Griffith, Impallaria, Johnson, McComas, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to take final action on an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity only after due consideration of certain factors including whether the applicant's design prioritizes the use or upgrading of existing infrastructure; prohibiting the construction of an overhead transmission line that is aligned with and within 1 mile of a conservation easement unless there is a certain showing of good cause; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0578
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity – Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:16 PM