Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Exemption for Auctioneers - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Miller, Adams, Arentz, T. Branch, Brooks, Carey, D.E. Davis, Fennell, Howard, Impallaria, Mautz, Qi, Rogers, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing an exemption from certain provisions relating to real estate brokers and licensure for licensed auctioneers while selling any real estate at public auction.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Estate Brokers - Exemption for Auctioneers - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Real Estate Brokers - Exemption for Auctioneers - Repeal
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:15 PM