Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Sample-Hughes, Anderton, Arentz, Bagnall, Beitzel, Crosby, Hartman, Jacobs, R. Lewis, Mautz, McKay, Morgan, Otto, Proctor, Rosenberg, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring oversight of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants from the Office of Student Financial Assistance within the Maryland Higher Education Commission to the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to submit a certain annual report to the General Assembly; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $1,000,000 from the Board of Physicians Fund to the Program if the Governor does not include the funds in the State budget in fiscal year 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0501
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604166/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604166/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {183120/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {553226/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {604166/1 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 47A
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {604166/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {183120/1 (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {553226/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 50
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 402
Text - Chapter - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-2801 through 18-2806 )
(   24-1701, 24-1701 through 24-1706, 24-1702, 24-1704, 24-1705, 24-1706, 24-1707 )
(   14-207, 15-206 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:15 PM