Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention
Sponsored by
Delegates Brooks, Anderson, Bhandari, Carey, Charles, Crutchfield, Forbes, Haynes, Hettleman, C. Jackson, McComas, Sample-Hughes, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention; requiring the Task Force to study certain issues related to veterans' suicide in the State; requiring the Task Force to coordinate and communicate with certain groups in completing a certain study; requiring the Task Force to make certain recommendations; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before certain dates; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Task Force to Study Veterans' Suicide Causes and Prevention
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:15 PM