Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing funds in the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for the costs associated with the purchase of certain nutrient load reductions, not to exceed $10,000,000 per year in fiscal years 2020 through 2030 inclusive; requiring certain regulations to be adopted in a certain manner and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the load reductions purchased under the Act to be consistent with certain accounting procedures and purchased through a certain procurement approach; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page