Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Bagnall, Barron, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or after July 1, 2021, pharmacy services administrative organizations to register with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner before providing certain services in the State; requiring certain applicants to file an application on a certain form and pay a certain fee; providing for the expiration and renewal of certain registration; prohibiting certain pharmacy services administrative organizations from entering into certain contracts; providing that a certain notice from the Commissioner constitutes a certain waiver; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0915
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {566988/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {507773/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {566988/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Amendment {507773/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
Text - Chapter - Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-2001 through 15-2019 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:14 PM