Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 394
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue a Class GCR (golf course restaurant) beer, wine, and liquor license in accordance with certain requirements; providing for the days and hours of sale for the license; and establishing an annual license fee of $3,500.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0376
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 394
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 394
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class GCR (Golf Course Restaurant) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
(   22-1003.1, 22-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:14 PM
Click to return on the top page