Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Real Property Transfer-on-Death Deed Task Force to study other jurisdictions that have implemented the use of a transfer-on-death deed for real property; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the implementation of a transfer-on-death deed in the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0698
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:18 PM
Click to return on the top page