Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations – Advanced Practice Registered Nurses – Delegation of Tasks
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Reilly, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that an advanced practice registered nurse is not precluded from delegating a nursing or other technical task to an assistant under certain circumstances; and requiring the State Board of Nursing to adopt regulations to provide the manner in which an advanced practice registered nurse delegates a certain task, establish limitations on the authority of an advanced practice registered nurse, and provide other clarifications.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Nursing Tasks
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {606080/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurses - Delegation of Nursing Tasks
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {606080/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Health Occupations – Advanced Practice Registered Nurses – Delegation of Tasks
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:12 PM