Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Sponsored by
Delegates M. Jackson and Krebs (By Request - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering references to the terms "9-1-1 fee" and "additional charge", respectively, to be "State 9-1-1 fee" and "county 9-1-1 fee", respectively, and altering the definition of "public safety answering point" for purposes of provisions of law concerning the 9-1-1 emergency telephone system; renaming the Emergency Number Systems Board to be the Maryland 9-1-1 Board; requiring a certain report by the Department of General Services by June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0838
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {516588/2 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {516588/2 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 375
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-301, 1-304, 1-304.1, 1-304.2, 1-305, 1-306, 1-307, 1-309, 1-310 through 1-312, 1-314 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:12 PM