Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Electricity and Gas Suppliers - Training and Educational Program
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to develop a training and educational program for certain licensed energy suppliers; requiring the Commission to develop the program in consultation with certain interested stakeholders, including electricity suppliers and gas suppliers; requiring designated representatives to demonstrate a thorough understanding of certain Commission regulations; requiring the Commission to conduct an examination at the conclusion of training and provide certification on a satisfactory score; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0603
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Electricity and Gas Suppliers - Training and Educational Program
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Electricity and Gas Suppliers - Training and Educational Program
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission - Electricity and Gas Suppliers - Training and Educational Program
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page