Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Surrender of Premises – Required Information to a Tenant or Other Occupant
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a court in a certain action for repossession to provide contact information for the appropriate county board of health and local department of social services to the tenant or other occupant of the premises under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant – Surrender of Premises – Required Information to a Tenant or Other Occupant
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:11 PM