Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Acevero, Johnson, Kelly, Morgan, and Saab
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the holder of presumed abandoned property valued at $1,000 or more to send certain written notice to the apparent owner by registered mail requiring a signature, rather than by first-class mail; requiring the holder of abandoned property valued at $1,000 or more to keep records relating to that property for at least 3 years; requiring that certain records be sufficient to allow a person who is able to recover the abandoned property to establish a tax basis; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {713094/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997277/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {773822/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {713094/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Abandoned Property - Notice and Records
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Finance 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {997277/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Floor Amendment {773822/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
(   17-308.2, 17-310, 17-312 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page