Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Human Services - Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Ivey, and Williams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program in Prince George's County to provide, improve, and study the effects of home visiting services for eligible households; defining "eligible household" as one located in Prince George's County that has a newborn who was delivered at a certain hospital; requiring the Prince George's County Department of Family Services, along with the Prince George's Child Resource Center, to begin the selection of eligible households to participate in the Program on or before September 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Human Services - Family Connects Home Visiting Pilot Program
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1301 through 8-1305 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:10 PM