Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Annual Land Preservation Fee MC 16-20
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring certain golf courses and country clubs in Montgomery County that are located on land with an average market value of at least $500,000 per acre to pay an annual land preservation fee to the county; and requiring the county to use 50% of the fees for projects eligible for funds under Program Open Space and 50% of the fees for county agricultural land preservation programs.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Annual Land Preservation Fee MC 16-20
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Reassigned to Ways and Means 26
House 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:09 PM