Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Acevero, Bridges, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Smith, Stewart, Terrasa, C. Watson, Wells, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain individuals; prohibiting individuals from simultaneously being a candidate for a party office and an elected public office; and prohibiting individuals from simultaneously holding a party office and an elected public office.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Party and Public Offices – Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {875064/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {503523/1 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-29)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Party and Public Offices – Prohibitions
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {875064/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Amendment {503523/1 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 47B
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47B
Text - Third - Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (101-29) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 1:45 PM