Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
Sponsored by
Delegate Hartman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt on each Sunday of the game bird and game mammal seasons in Worcester County; and authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt on public land designated for hunting by the Department on Sundays in Worcester County.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0633
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page