Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Energy Administration)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program established by a county or municipality to include loans to certain residential and commercial property owners to finance certain grid resilience projects; and requiring a certain ordinance or resolution that establishes a certain clean energy loan program to include certain eligibility requirements for certain grid resilience projects.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Rules
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273691/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {273691/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Rules 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1101, 1-1102, 1-1103, 1-1104 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:08 PM