Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Acevero, Carr, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Holmes, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, Lisanti, Lopez, Moon, Qi, Shetty, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish a beverage container deposit program on or before September 1, 2021; establishing the Advisory Commission to Develop a Beverage Container Deposit Program; requiring the Advisory Commission to develop a framework for a beverage container deposit program; requiring the Advisory Committee to report its framework and recommendations to certain members and committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1710.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:07 PM