Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Fire Marshal - Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Cardin, and Holmes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 334
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Fire Marshal to enforce any requirements relating to the installation of automatic sprinkler systems in new one- and two-family dwellings.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0746
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Fire Marshal – Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {330017/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Fire Marshal - Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-27)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 334
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Fire Marshal - Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Fire Marshal – Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {330017/1 Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Adams) Adopted 43A
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - State Fire Marshal - Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (106-27) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 334
Text - Chapter - State Fire Marshal - Sprinkler Systems Enforcement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:07 PM