Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving certain compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of certain expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations on how to update the Maryland Recycling Act; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Review and Update the Maryland Recycling Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {990713/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Task Force to Review and Update the Maryland Recycling Act
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {990713/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on Recycling Policy and Recycling and Waste Systems in Maryland
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page