Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Boteler, Boyce, Ebersole, Fennell, Griffith, Hettleman, Mangione, Metzgar, Proctor, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters relating to the State's current and future workforce and emerging digital economy; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:06 PM