Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention in Student Violence (Good Teacher Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Cox, Anderton, Arikan, Atterbeary, Boyce, Brooks, Buckel, Cain, Cardin, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Corderman, Grammer, Hartman, Hornberger, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Krimm, Mangione, McComas, Metzgar, Morgan, Parrott, Pippy, Proctor, Saab, Shoemaker, Smith, Szeliga, Valderrama, R. Watson, Wivell, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a staff member of a school, acting in an official capacity, is not civilly liable for personal injury or property damage resulting from intervention in a student altercation or other student disturbance if the staff member intervened in a reasonably prudent manner and the actions taken do not constitute grossly negligent, willful, wanton, or intentionally tortious conduct.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {302813/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention in Student Violence (Good Teacher Protection Act)
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {302813/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Civil Immunity - Educator Intervention in Student Violence (Good Teacher Protection Act)
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:06 PM