Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, and Ghrist
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the days and hours of sale under a Class B wine shop and lounge license in Kent County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Kent County to issue a refillable container permit for draft beer to certain license holders; establishing an application process, hours of sale, and fees for the permit; requiring the Board to adopt certain regulations; authorizing the Board to issue a Class C multiple event beer, wine, and liquor license; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0792
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 322
Text - Chapter - Kent County Alcohol Act of 2020
(   24-1003, 24-102, 24-1101, 24-1102, 24-1309, 24-1310 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page