Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Arikan, Griffith, McComas, Arentz, Brooks, Carey, Charkoudian, Crosby, Fennell, Howard, C. Jackson, Qi, Queen, Rogers, Turner, Valderrama, Walker, C. Watson, and Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 319
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each room accessible for individuals with disabilities in a lodging establishment to be furnished with a bed of at least a certain height beginning December 31, 2021; requiring 25% by December 31, 2021, 50% by December 31, 2022, 75% by December 31, 2023, and 100% beginning December 31, 2024 of accessible rooms in a lodging establishment to be furnished with a bed of a certain height; and defining the term "accessible room" as one that is in compliance with certain Americans with Disabilities Act guidelines; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0158
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333892/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 319
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {333892/1 Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Finance 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 319
Text - Chapter - Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-201, 15-208 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:05 PM