Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - High School Students - Graduation and Attendance Credit for Vocational Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Grammer, Griffith, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Miller, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to award credit to a high school student toward a high school diploma or a postsecondary credential, or both, for one vocational course per semester in a career and technical education program approved by the county board; and authorizing a county board to count toward high school attendance the time a high school student spends during vocational training in a career and technical education program approved by the county board.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0133
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - High School Students - Graduation and Attendance Credit for Vocational Training
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205.4, 7-301.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:05 PM