Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employment Discrimination – Time for Filing Complaints
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Ebersole, Qi, Bagnall, Barron, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending from 6 months to 300 days the time periods within which a person claiming to be aggrieved by certain discriminatory acts is required to file a complaint with the Commission on Civil Rights; and providing that a complaint filed with a local human relations commission within certain time periods is deemed to have complied with certain provisions of the Act.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1007
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {436481/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Employment Discrimination – Time for Filing Complaints
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices - Time for Filing Complaints
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {436481/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Employment Discrimination – Time for Filing Complaints
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:03 PM