Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bridges, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Terrasa, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Personnel Services and Benefits within the Department of Budget and Management to study the number and salaries of certain employees employed by certain State agencies in a position of grade 19 or above who are African American, Hispanic, or any other racial minority and report its findings to the Governor and a certain committee of the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2020, and June 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1046 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:02 PM