Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Cullison, Acevero, Fraser-Hidalgo, Attar, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Boyce, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Hettleman, Johnson, Kaiser, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, Wells, Wilkins, K. Young, Charles, Hill, Kerr, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on LGBTQ Affairs in the Governor's Office of Community Initiatives; providing for the appointment, qualifications, terms, and removal of Commission members; requiring the Commission to elect annually a chair and vice chair and to meet under certain circumstances; authorizing the Commission to appoint a director under certain circumstances; establishing that the director is a special appointment; establishing the duties of the director and the Commission; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {336084/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-28)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {336084/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Commission on LGBTQ Affairs - Established
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (104-28) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9.5-101, 9.5-501 through 9.5-508 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:02 PM