Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a requirement that a petition for guardianship of a disabled person include signed and verified certificates of competency by providing that the certificates may be signed and verified by a nurse practitioner and certain other health care practitioners; altering the requirements for the certification of a patient's incapacity to make an informed decision regarding treatment or of a patient's terminal or end-stage condition to allow the second individual making the certification to be a nurse practitioner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0576
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {686485/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {686485/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:01 PM