Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Environmental Policy Act - Consistency With National Environmental Policy Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain methods and procedures adopted by State agencies be consistent with the regulations implementing the National Environmental Policy Act as the regulations existed on January 1, 2020; requiring that an environmental effects report meet the requirements of the regulations implementing the National Environmental Policy Act as the regulations existed on January 1, 2020; providing for a certain contingency; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Environmental Policy Act - Consistency With National Environmental Policy Act
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-303, 1-304 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:01 PM