Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Public Schools – Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Kerr
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education and authorizing a nonpublic school, beginning in the 2021-2022 school year, to require at least two school employees to be trained in recognizing the signs and symptoms of a seizure, administering first aid for a seizure, and administering or assisting with the administration of seizure medication and performing manual vagus nerve stimulation; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Public Schools – Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Education – Public Schools – Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act)
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:01 PM