Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Carr, Cox, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Grammer, Griffith, Kerr, Lopez, Malone, Solomon, and Williams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 616
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the establishment of a certain health savings account; providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain health savings accounts; providing that a health savings account is established on the first day that an individual becomes covered under a high deductible health plan; requiring a health savings account to be opened with a trustee or custodian within a certain time period; and clarifying that a health savings account is established regardless of certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Finance
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0507
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Health Savings Accounts - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {982717/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 616
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Health Savings Accounts - Establishment
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Reassigned to Judiciary 20
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {982717/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Finance 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 616
Text - Chapter - Health Savings Accounts – Establishment and Application of Trust Law
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-144 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:00 PM