Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (The Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Bagnall, Brooks, Carr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Moon, Solomon, Terrasa, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer a maintenance injectable medication to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2021, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt regulations establishing standard procedures for approving classes of maintenance injectable medications and requiring pharmacists to complete a certain training program in order to administer a maintenance injectable medication; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {106780/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {106780/1 Adopted 41
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (The Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 42A
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 43
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-509 )
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:00 PM