Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates P. Young, Anderton, Boyce, Brooks, Charles, Crosby, Crutchfield, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hettleman, M. Jackson, Love, Qi, and Sample-Hughes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 286
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to charge a certain additional fee on the issuance of special registration plates for recipients of an individually earned, combat-related armed forces medal that results in a surplus of at least $10 for each issuance of new registration plates; requiring that the additional fee be credited to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0773 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 286
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43A
Text - Third - Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 52
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Ready) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 286
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:01 PM